US HB5281 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires pass-through pricing models, and prohibits spread-pricing, for payment arrangements with pharmacy benefit managers under Medicaid. The bill also extends funding for retail pharmacy surveys and requires additional information with respect to price concessions, dispensing fees, and survey participation to be made publicly available.
Title
Drug Price Transparency in Medicaid Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-12-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2543 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 225.
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
HB19 (Related) 2019-12-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.
SB4199 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4228)
Subjects
Business records
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Home and outpatient care
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Home and outpatient care
Inflation and prices
Medicaid
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Retail and wholesale trades
State and local government operations
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/5281/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr5281/BILLS-116hr5281ih.pdf |