US HB4619 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires drug manufacturers, subject to civil penalties, to issue rebates to the Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services for covered drugs under the Medicare prescription drug benefit that cost $100 or more and for which the average manufacturer price increases faster than inflation.
Title
Pharmaceutical REPAI Act Pharmaceutical Rebates for Excessive Pricing Above Inflation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Business records
Civil actions and liability
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Civil actions and liability
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4619/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4619/BILLS-116hr4619ih.pdf |