US HB4676 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands guaranteed issue rights with respect to Medigap policies (Medicare supplemental health insurance policies) to all beneficiaries regardless of age. (Guaranteed issue rights require that a policy be offered to any eligible applicant without regard to health status.) The bill provides for a phased implementation over a five-year period, with full implementation by January 1, 2028.
Title
Protecting Medicare Beneficiaries with Pre-Existing Conditions Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-10-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3 (Related) 2020-09-08 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 521.
Subjects
Government information and archives
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Insurance industry and regulation
Medicare
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Insurance industry and regulation
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/4676/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr4676/BILLS-116hr4676ih.pdf |