TN HB2215 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 844
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 844
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Jaclyn's Law," which, in certain circumstances, provides civil immunity for first responders when using forcible entry to enter premises to render emergency assistance when responding to 911 call. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86; Title 29; Title 63, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
As enacted, enacts "Jaclyn's Law," which, in certain circumstances, provides civil immunity for first responders when using forcible entry to enter premises to render emergency assistance when responding to 911 call. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86; Title 29; Title 63, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: 1 & 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Barnes (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Rule 39(3) AMEND# 2 BY Barnes (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - House - (VOICE VOTE) JUDICIARY SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Judiciary Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 844 | |
2012-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/27/12 | |
2012-04-27 | Signed by Governor. | |
2012-04-18 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2012-04-18 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2012-04-17 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2012-04-17 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2012-04-16 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 & 2, Ayes 91, Nays 6, PNV 1 | |
2012-04-12 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/16/2012 | |
2012-04-12 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 5, PNV 1 | |
2012-04-12 | S. adopted am. 2 | |
2012-04-12 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2012-04-12 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2012-02-23 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2012-02-16 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2012-02-16 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2012-02-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0678) | |
2012-02-16 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0704) | |
2012-02-14 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/16/2012 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/14/2012 | |
2012-02-07 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 2/7/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 2/1/2012 | |
2012-01-12 | Assigned to s/c Judiciary Subcommittee | |
2012-01-12 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-12-13 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2480 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 844