TN SB2480 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 844
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 844
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts "Jaclyn's Law," which, in certain circumstances, provides civil immunity for first responders when using forcible entry to enter premises to render emergency assistance when responding to 911 call. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86; Title 29; Title 63, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Title
As enacted, enacts "Jaclyn's Law," which, in certain circumstances, provides civil immunity for first responders when using forcible entry to enter premises to render emergency assistance when responding to 911 call. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 86; Title 29; Title 63, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 140.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-03 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 844 | |
2012-04-12 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-11 | S. Reset on cal. for 4/12/2012 | |
2012-04-09 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/11/2012 | |
2012-04-03 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2012-03-28 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/3/2012 | |
2012-03-21 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/27/2012 | |
2012-03-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/20/2012 | |
2012-01-19 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2012-01-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2215 (Crossfiled) 2012-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 844