ME LD2174 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Protect Consumers from Predatory Medical Credit Card Providers
Title
An Act to Protect Consumers from Predatory Medical Credit Card Providers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #733 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #731 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Adopt Sas-700 RC #717 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #694 (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #499 (Y: 91 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Accept Minority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #677 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #731 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Adopt Sas-700 RC #717 (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #694 (Y: 11 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #499 (Y: 91 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Senate - Accept Minority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #677 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Subsequently The Senate INSISTED To PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "A" (S-700) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 733 Yeas 12 - Nays 22 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland moved to RECEDE and CONCUR |
2024-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator CHIPMAN of Cumberland The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the INSIST was moved |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Subsequently The Senate INSISTED |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered FAILED Roll Call Number 731 Yeas 12 - Nays 22 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senator STEWART of Aroostook moved to RECEDE and CONCUR |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved to The Senate INSIST |
2024-04-15 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-15 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-04-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-700) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-700) thereto ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 717 Yeas 21 - Nays 12 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Subsequently Senate Amendment "A" (S-700) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) READ ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ADOPTION of Senate Amendment "A" (S-700) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-700) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECEDED whereby Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) was ADOPTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator to Recede whereby The Senate PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senator BAILEY of York moved to RECONSIDER whereby The Senate INSISTED |
2024-04-12 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator GROHOSKI of Hancock. |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Subsequently The Senate INSISTED To Accept The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 694 Yeas 11 - Nays 22 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 FAILED |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senator STEWART of Aroostook moved The Senate RECEDE and CONCUR |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved The Senate INSIST |
2024-04-11 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-04-11 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2024-04-11 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 499 (Yeas 91 - Nays 55 - Absent 4 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2024-04-11 | House | On motion of Representative PERRY of Calais, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reports READ. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-678) READ and ADOPTED |
2024-04-10 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 677 Yeas 24 - Nays 10 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2024-04-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAILEY of York The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2024-04-09 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP-AM |
2024-03-26 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-03-26 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2024-03-20 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2024-03-20 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2024-03-13 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-03-06 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2024-01-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2024-01-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |