RI S2776 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-04 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Education -- Cooperative Service Among School Districts (would Require Regional Collaboratives To Distribute Textbooks In Accordance With Rhode Island Law)
Title
An Act Relating To Education -- Cooperative Service Among School Districts (would Require Regional Collaboratives To Distribute Textbooks In Accordance With Rhode Island Law)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-04 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2010-06-03 | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-26 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-05-26 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-05-12 | Committee continued | |
2010-05-12 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2776.pdf |