RI S2478 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Gradually increases the minimum hourly wage for employees of employers who provide services to five (5) or more persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] |
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/14/2018) |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/07/2018) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2478.pdf |