RI S2056 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of powdered caffeine to any person under the age of eighteen (18) and the possession of powdered caffeine by anyone under eighteen (18) or the possession of powered caffeine on a school premises or public playground.
Title
Relating To Food And Drugs-regulation Of Powdered Caffeine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Regulation of powdered caffeine approval of amendment lc 003056/2 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Regulation of powdered caffeine approval of amendment lc 003056/2 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-03-25 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2016-03-03 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/02/2016) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/21/2016) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |