RI H7847 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes any vendor, agent, contractor, or designee who operates an electronic medical health record (EMR) or clinical management system to have access to the prescription drug monitoring program (PDMP).
Title
Uniformed Controlled Substance Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
2016-05-25 | House | House read and passed |
2016-05-20 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2016) |
2016-05-04 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-29 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/04/2016) |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016) |
2016-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |