RI H7215 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends expiration date from 6/30/16 to 6/30/17 for approvals/permits issued by towns/cities in effect from 11/9/09 and 6/30/17 without reviving any expired approval/permit.
Title
Subdivision Of Land
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - Senate - Subdivision of land (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
2016-03-15 | House | House read and passed |
2016-03-11 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/15/2016) |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-03-07 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/10/2016) |
2016-02-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2016) |
2016-01-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |