RI H7139 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INSURANCE -- CONTROL OF HIGH PRESCRIPTION COSTS -- REGULATION OF PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS - Regulates PBMs policies and practices relating to accurate costs and pricing reporting, restricts discriminatory practices and establishes consumer protections and enforcement of penalties for violations by the office of the attorney general.
Title
Regulates PBMs policies and practices relating to accurate costs and pricing reporting, restricts discriminatory practices and establishes consumer protections and enforcement of penalties for violations by the office of the attorney general.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lombardi [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Jennifer Stewart [D] |
Rep. Cherie Cruz [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-01-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/30/2024) |
2024-01-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Insurance
INSURANCE -- CONTROL OF HIGH PRESCRIPTION COSTS
INSURANCE -- CONTROL OF HIGH PRESCRIPTION COSTS -- REGULATION OF PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS
INSURANCE -- CONTROL OF HIGH PRESCRIPTION COSTS
INSURANCE -- CONTROL OF HIGH PRESCRIPTION COSTS -- REGULATION OF PHARMACY BENEFIT MANAGERS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7139.pdf |