RI H7139 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits lobbyists from making any political contributions to any member of the general assembly from January 1 through July 1 in any year, unless the general assembly adjourns for the year prior to July 1.
Title
The Rhode Island Lobbying Reform Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-01-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/25/2022) |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7139.pdf |