RI H7139 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Finance -- The American Recovery And Reinvestment Act--bonds (income From Investments In The Capital Development Fund May Be Applied To Capital Purposes And Not Become Part Of The General Fund To The Extent To Exempt The Interest Paid From Federal Taxation)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Finance -- The American Recovery And Reinvestment Act--bonds (income From Investments In The Capital Development Fund May Be Applied To Capital Purposes And Not Become Part Of The General Fund To The Extent To Exempt The Interest Paid From Federal Taxation)
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Carter [D] | Rep. Gregory Costantino [D] | Rep. Joanne Giannini [D] | Rep. Helio Melo [D] |
Rep. Agostinho Silva [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-03-23 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-03-23 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate Finance | |
2010-02-02 | House passed Sub A | |
2010-01-27 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-01-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-01-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7139.pdf |