RI H7052 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds dyslexia-targeted assistance as a required aspect of the literacy program for students at the elementary grade level.
Title
Relating To Education
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. John Desimone [D] | Rep. Doreen Costa [R] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] |
Rep. Cale Keable [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2016) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2016-02-03 | House | House read and passed |
2016-01-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (02/03/2016) |
2016-01-20 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-01-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (01/20/2016) |
2016-01-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-01-08 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/13/2016) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |