RI H5878 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires public schools, including charter schools, to begin the school year on the day after Labor Day commencing in the school year 2020-2021.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents - Beginning Of School Year
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-04-05 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2019) |
2019-03-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H5878.pdf |