OK SB958 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB958
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; clarifying admissibility of certain expert testimony. Effective date.
Title
Criminal procedure; clarifying admissibility of certain expert testimony. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Floyd [D] | Rep. Kevin West [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-25 | House | General Order |
2019-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Floyd |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB958 (Carry Over) 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019