OK SB958 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Criminal procedure; clarifying admissibility of certain expert testimony. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal procedure; clarifying admissibility of certain expert testimony. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateApproved by Governor 05/02/2019
2019-04-29SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-29HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-29SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-25SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2
2019-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Floyd
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback