OK SB2088 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Gaming; creating the Task Force for the Study of Lottery and Gaming Revenues.
Title
Gaming; creating the Task Force for the Study of Lottery and Gaming Revenues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Died in conference | |
2010-05-03 | SCs named GCCA | |
2010-04-29 | Conference granted, HC's named Benge, Shannon, Trebilcock, Morgan, Carey | |
2010-04-28 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2010-04-26 | HAs read | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-22 | Motion expired | |
2010-04-21 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Sullivan | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 9; Ayes: 50 Nays: 37 | |
2010-04-21 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fields | |
2010-04-21 | General Order | |
2010-04-07 | Title restored | |
2010-04-07 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 12 | |
2010-03-09 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 | |
2010-03-09 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Ford | |
2010-03-09 | Measure failed: Ayes: 22 Nays: 25 | |
2010-03-09 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-22 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2010-02-22 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-22 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-18 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-11 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-11 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3A | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3A | 703 | New Code | See Bill Text |