OK SB1636 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife; requiring the Oklahoma Department of Wildlife Conservation to produce study on elk population. Effective date.
Title
Wildlife; requiring the Oklahoma Department of Wildlife Conservation to produce study on elk population. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Tourism & Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bullard |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |