OK HB2966 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2966
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Received from House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-24 - Received from House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; charter schools; evaluation; contracts; funds; accounts; governing board; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; charter schools; evaluation; contracts; funds; accounts; governing board; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-05-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-05-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-05-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 17 |
2021-05-24 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2021-05-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dills, Moore |
2021-05-24 | House | General Order |
2021-05-24 | House | House Rule suspended |
2021-05-17 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-05-12 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2021-05-12 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2966 (Carry Over) 2021-05-24 - Received from House