OK HB2596 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Poor persons; specifying content of the cash and counseling program. Effective date.
Title
Poor persons; specifying content of the cash and counseling program. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/05/2010 | |
2010-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-24 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-21 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-21 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-17 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-17 | To Senate | |
2010-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1 | |
2010-05-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Joyner, Shelton | |
2010-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker | |
2010-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2010-04-28 | HC's named: Morrissette, Trebilcock, Derby, Nelson, Ownbey, Tibbs, Joyner, Billy, Wright (Harold), Inman, Hamilton, Scott, Pittman, Cannaday, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-07 | SA's received | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 | |
2010-03-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Nelson, Ownbey, Wright (Harold), Tibbs | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Corn | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Coates (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Morrissette | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |