OK HB2406 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2406
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; creating the Individual Health Insurance Market Stabilization Act; emergency.
Title
Insurance; creating the Individual Health Insurance Market Stabilization Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-26 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2017-05-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-05-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6 |
2017-05-24 | House | JCR adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | General Order |
2017-05-23 | House | Emergency added |
2017-05-23 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-09 | House | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2017-05-08 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Fields |
2017-05-08 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-05-08 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace |
2017-05-08 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2406 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 6530 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6530 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6530 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6530 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6530 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6530 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6530 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6530 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6530 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 6530 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |