OK HB2406 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Insurance; creating the Individual Health Insurance Market Stabilization Act; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; creating the Individual Health Insurance Market Stabilization Act; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26HouseApproved by Governor 06/06/2017
2017-05-26HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-26HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-26HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-26SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-26SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 11
2017-05-26SenateJCR adopted
2017-05-25SenateDirect to Calendar
2017-05-24SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-24HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-05-24HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-05-24HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6
2017-05-24HouseJCR adopted
2017-05-24HouseGeneral Order
2017-05-23HouseEmergency added
2017-05-23HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2017-05-09HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2017-05-08HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Fields
2017-05-08HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2017-05-08HouseAuthored by Representative Osborn (Leslie), Wallace
2017-05-08HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3665301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
36653010Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3665302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3665303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3665304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3665305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3665306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3665307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3665308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3665309Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback