OK HB2223 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; directing the State Department of Education to maintain the dyslexia handbook; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; directing the State Department of Education to maintain the dyslexia handbook; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseApproved by Governor 04/28/2021
2021-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-26SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-04-21HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-04-21SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2021-04-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2021-04-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2021-03-23SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2021-03-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Stephens
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2021-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-08HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-08HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2021-03-08HouseAmended
2021-03-08HouseHouse Rule suspended
2021-03-08HouseConsidered
2021-03-01HouseLaid over
2021-03-01HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Davis
2021-03-01HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-09HouseAuthored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author)
2021-02-09HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Dobrinski
2021-02-09HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Randleman
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2223&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2223%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2223%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2223%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2223%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB2223%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2223%20FA1%20RANDLEMANRA-EK(UNTIMELY%20FILED).PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2223%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2223%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2223%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/HB2223%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2223_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2223_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback