NY S07384 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10248B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10248B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the commissioner of health to develop a standard prior prescription drug authorization form for managed care providers.
Title
Directs the commissioner of health to develop a standard prior prescription drug authorization form for managed care providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10248B |
2012-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1441 |
2012-06-12 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7384A |
2012-06-12 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A10248 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - signed chap.466