NY A10248 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-3)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - signed chap.466
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of health to develop a standard prior prescription drug authorization request form for managed care providers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of health to develop a standard prior prescription drug authorization request form for managed care providers.

Sponsors

Asm. Peter Rivera [D]Asm. Richard Gottfried [D]Asm. Karim Camara [D]Asm. Nelson Castro [D]
Asm. Marcos Crespo [D]Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D]Asm. William Scarborough [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]
Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Alec Brook-Krasny [D]Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D]Asm. Vanessa Gibson [D]
Asm. Naomi Rivera [D]Asm. Earlene Hooper [D]Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Aileen Gunther [D]
Asm. William Magnarelli [D]Asm. Samuel Roberts [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]Asm. Guillermo Linares [D]
Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. William Colton [D]
Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]Asm. Robert Reilly [D]
Asm. Michael Simanowitz [D]Asm. Alan Maisel [D]Asm. Rhoda Jacobs [D]Asm. Daniel Burling [R]
Asm. William Boyland [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]Asm. Harvey Weisenberg [D]Asm. Nick Perry [D]
Asm. Michelle Schimel [D]Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Dennis Gabryszak [D]Asm. Eric Stevenson [D]
Asm. Matthew Titone [D]Asm. Rafael Espinal [D]Asm. Phillip Goldfeder [D]Asm. James Brennan [D]
Asm. Harry Bronson [D]Asm. Barbara Clark [D]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Clifford Crouch [R]
Asm. Deborah Glick [D]Asm. Carl Heastie [D]Sen. George Latimer [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. William Magee [D]Asm. Joan Millman [D]Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D]
Asm. Addie Jenne [D]Asm. Frank Skartados [D]Asm. Robert Sweeney [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]
Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Helene Weinstein [D]

Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03Senatesigned chap.466
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1441
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7384A
2012-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.364
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.364
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-13Assemblyprint number 10248b
2012-06-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2012-05-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-05-21Assemblyprint number 10248a
2012-05-21Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to health
2012-05-16Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S07384 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10248B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10248&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10248&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10248
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10248&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10248A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10248&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A10248B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A10248&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A10248#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback