NY S06981 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.467
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the threshold amount for the requirement for public bidding of construction contracts let by the facilities development corporation.
Title
Increases the threshold amount for the requirement for public bidding of construction contracts let by the facilities development corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.467 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.313 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9612 |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-05-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.391 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09612 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6981