NY A09612 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-17 - substituted by s6981
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the threshold amount for the requirement for public bidding of construction contracts let by the facilities development corporation.
Title
Increases the threshold amount for the requirement for public bidding of construction contracts let by the facilities development corporation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s6981 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.313 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.313 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06981 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - SIGNED CHAP.467