NY S06884 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.318
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.318
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds certain parcels of land in the city of Peekskill and in the town of Greenburgh to the list of premises which are exempt from the provisions of law which restrict manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.
Title
Adds certain parcels of land in the city of Peekskill and in the town of Greenburgh to the list of premises which are exempt from the provisions of law which restrict manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.318 |
2016-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.186 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9674b |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2016-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-01 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6884B |
2016-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6884A |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1009 |
2016-05-23 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09674 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6884b