NY A09674 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6884b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-14 - substituted by s6884b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds certain parcels of land in the city of Peekskill and in the town of Greenburgh to the list of premises which are exempt from the provisions of law which restrict manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.
Title
Adds certain parcels of land in the city of Peekskill and in the town of Greenburgh to the list of premises which are exempt from the provisions of law which restrict manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | substituted by s6884b |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.186 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.186 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | print number 9674b |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | print number 9674a |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to economic development |
2016-03-29 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06884 (Same As) 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.318