NY S06181 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that rent arrears be repaid; forgives any outstanding repayment agreements for rent arrears.
Title
Removes the requirement that rent arrears be repaid; forgives any outstanding repayment agreements for rent arrears.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Social Services Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.212 |
2024-01-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6181A |
2024-01-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
2023-05-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-04-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO SOCIAL SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
A05514 (Same As) 2024-01-11 - print number 5514a