NY A05514 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - print number 5514a
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - print number 5514a
Pending: Assembly Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that rent arrears be repaid; forgives any outstanding repayment agreements for rent arrears.
Title
Removes the requirement that rent arrears be repaid; forgives any outstanding repayment agreements for rent arrears.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | Assembly | print number 5514a |
2024-01-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to social services |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to social services |
2023-03-15 | Assembly | referred to social services |
Same As/Similar To
S06181 (Same As) 2024-01-29 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING