NY S04806 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the time between appointing an acting department head and the governor submitting a name for new department head to one hundred eighty days or two hundred seventy days when the senate is adjourned.
Title
Limits the time between appointing an acting department head and the governor submitting a name for new department head to one hundred eighty days or two hundred seventy days when the senate is adjourned.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-02-15 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 4806A |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.196 |
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2017-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.871 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-03-10 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-03-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |