NY S04276 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7646A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7646A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the jurisdiction of St. Regis Mohawk tribal police officers.
Title
Relates to the jurisdiction of St. Regis Mohawk tribal police officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7646A |
2017-06-05 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 4276B |
2017-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 4276A |
2017-05-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1010 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07646 (Same As) 2017-07-24 - signed chap.96