NY A07646 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - signed chap.96
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-24 - signed chap.96
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the jurisdiction of St. Regis Mohawk tribal police officers.
Title
Relates to the jurisdiction of St. Regis Mohawk tribal police officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-24 | Senate | signed chap.96 |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1010 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4276B |
2017-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.164 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.164 |
2017-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7646a |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2017-05-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04276 (Same As) 2017-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7646A