NY S04030 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.92
Status: Introduced on April 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.92
Summary
Treats the death of a relevant person, for the purposes of the devolution of property, within 120 hours of the decedent or other event as predeceasing the decedent or other event.
Title
Treats the death of a relevant person, for the purposes of the devolution of property, within 120 hours of the decedent or other event as predeceasing the decedent or other event.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | SUBSTITUTED BY A2762A | |
2009-05-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2009-05-20 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2009-05-19 | 1ST REPORT CAL.359 | |
2009-04-07 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02762 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.92
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S04030&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |