NY A02762 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.92
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-11 - signed chap.92
Summary
This bill repeals the Estates Powers and Trusts Law (the "EPTL") section 2-1.6, which is presently based upon actual simultaneous death, and replaces it with language which treats the death of a relevant person within 120 hours of the decedent as predeceasing the decedent.
Title
Treats the death of a relevant person, for the purposes of the devolution of property, within 120 hours of the decedent or other event as predeceasing the decedent or other event.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-11 | signed chap.92 | |
2009-07-10 | delivered to governor | |
2009-06-02 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-06-02 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-05-26 | 3RD READING CAL.359 | |
2009-05-26 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S4030 | |
2009-05-04 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2009-05-04 | delivered to senate | |
2009-05-04 | passed assembly | |
2009-04-23 | advanced to third reading cal.371 | |
2009-04-20 | reported | |
2009-04-02 | print number 2762a | |
2009-04-02 | amend and recommit to judiciary | |
2009-01-21 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S04030 (Same As) 2009-07-11 - signed chap.92
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A02762&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |