NY S01963 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the state fee for marriage licenses when either party making application for such marriage license is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty and authorizes towns and cities to elect to waive their fees for marriage licenses and certificates when either applicant is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Title
Waives the state fee for marriage licenses when either party making application for such marriage license is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty and authorizes towns and cities to elect to waive their fees for marriage licenses and certificates when either applicant is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2017-02-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1963A |
2017-02-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2017-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A01268 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - print number 1268b