NY A01268 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - print number 1268b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-31 - print number 1268b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Waives the state fee for marriage licenses when either party making application for such marriage license is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty and authorizes towns and cities to elect to waive their fees for marriage licenses and certificates when either applicant is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Title
Waives the state fee for marriage licenses when either party making application for such marriage license is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty and authorizes towns and cities to elect to waive their fees for marriage licenses and certificates when either applicant is a member of the United States armed forces on active duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-31 | Assembly | print number 1268b |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | print number 1268a |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2017-01-11 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S01963 (Same As) 2017-03-15 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
S07424 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
S07424 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY