NY S00871 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes ballot by mail by removing cause for absentee ballot voting.
Title
Authorizes ballot by mail by removing cause for absentee ballot voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-02-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
S01049 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
A00778 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
A00778 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY