NY S01049 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes ballot by mail by removing cause for absentee ballot voting.
Title
Authorizes ballot by mail by removing cause for absentee ballot voting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-14 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Assembly | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2019-01-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO SECRETARY OF STATE |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.7 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | substituted for a778 |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2019-01-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-01-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-01-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.4 |
2019-01-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-01-11 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2019-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
S00871 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
A00778 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
A00778 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY