NY S00463 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of forged instruments; includes the sale and manufacture of government issued documents in the class C felony of forgery in the first degree.
Title
Prohibits the sale of forged instruments; includes the sale and manufacture of government issued documents in the class C felony of forgery in the first degree.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1404 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.70 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A06149 (Same As) 2017-02-27 - referred to codes