NY A10483 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-03 - substituted by s9086
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office for people with developmental disabilities to produce and publish a report to assess the staffing and other issues causing the continued displacement of individuals with developmental disabilities from various state-operated institutions under the jurisdiction of the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Title
Requires the office for people with developmental disabilities to produce and publish a report to assess the staffing and other issues causing the continued displacement of individuals with developmental disabilities from various state-operated institutions under the jurisdiction of the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s9086 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.655 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | rules report cal.655 |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | reported |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S09086 (Same As) 2022-11-23 - VETOED MEMO.83