NY A09806 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 72-32)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Sponsors

Asm. Kimberly Jean-Pierre [D]Asm. Michael Miller [D]Asm. Felix Ortiz [D]Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D]
Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D]Asm. Anthony D'Urso [D]Asm. David McDonough [R]Asm. Andrew Raia [R]
Asm. Michael Montesano [R]Asm. Joseph Giglio [R]Asm. Philip Ramos [D]Asm. Matthew Titone [D]
Asm. Jose Rivera [D]Asm. Michele Titus [D]Asm. Dan Quart [D]Asm. Sandra Galef [D]
Asm. Ellen Jaffee [D]Asm. Carrie Woerner [D]Asm. Peter Lawrence [R]Asm. Edward Ra [R]
Asm. Joseph Errigo [R]Asm. Vivian Cook [D]Asm. Inez Dickens [D]Asm. Charles Lavine [D]
Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D]Asm. Charles Barron [D]Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte [D]Asm. Jeffrey Dinowitz [D]
Asm. Michael Benedetto [D]Asm. Carmen Arroyo [D]Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D]Asm. Kevin Byrne [R]
Asm. Robert Carroll [D]Asm. Melissa Miller [R]Asm. Andrew Garbarino [R]Asm. Gary Pretlow [D]
Asm. David DiPietro [R]Asm. Mark Johns [R]Asm. Didi Barrett [D]Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D]
Asm. Mark Weprin [D]Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D]Asm. Ron Castorina [R]Asm. Mary Walsh [R]
Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D]Asm. Michael Cusick [D]Asm. Jaime Williams [D]Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D]
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D]Asm. John McDonald [D]Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D]Asm. Brian Miller [R]
Asm. Walter Mosley [D]Asm. David Buchwald [D]Asm. Karl Brabenec [R]Asm. William Colton [D]
Asm. Nick Perry [D]Asm. Steve Stern [D]Asm. Albert Stirpe [D]Asm. Phillip Steck [D]
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D]Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D]Asm. Alfred Taylor [D]Asm. Doug Smith [R]
Asm. Michaelle Solages [D]Asm. Patricia Fahy [D]Asm. Latrice Walker [D]Asm. Barbara Lifton [D]
Asm. Pamela Hunter [D]Asm. Daniel Rosenthal [D]Asm. Nathalia Fernandez [D]Asm. Clyde Vanel [D]
Asm. Earlene Hooper [D]Asm. Nicole Malliotakis [R]Asm. Christopher Tague [R]Asm. Anthony Palumbo [R]
Asm. Robert Rodriguez [D]Asm. Marc Butler [R]Asm. Gary Finch [R]Asm. Victor Pichardo [D]
Asm. Stephen Hawley [R]Asm. Erik Dilan [D]Asm. Diane Richardson [D]Asm. Peter Abbate [D]
Asm. Jacob Ashby [R]Asm. Kenneth Blankenbush [R]Asm. Brian Curran [R]Asm. Maritza Davila [D]
Asm. Michael DenDekker [D]Asm. Steven Englebright [D]Asm. Harvey Epstein [D]Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R]
Asm. Christopher Friend [R]Asm. Dov Hikind [D]Asm. Ron Kim [D]Asm. Joseph Lentol [D]
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D]Asm. Dean Murray [R]Asm. Robert Oaks [R]Asm. Philip Palmesano [R]
Asm. Jo Simon [D]Asm. Aravella Simotas [D]Asm. Fred Thiele [D]Asm. Raymond Walter [R]

Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.299
2018-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.299
2018-06-18Assemblyreported
2018-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-15Assemblyprint number 9806a
2018-06-15Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2018-06-06Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-02-09Assemblyreferred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development

Same As/Similar To

S07677 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
S09092 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09806&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09806&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09806
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09806&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09806A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09806&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09806&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09806&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09806&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback