PA SB766 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for State Planning Board.
Title
In organization of departmental administrative boards and commissions and of advisory boards and commissions, further providing for State Planning Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Carolyn Comitta [D] | Sen. Scott Hutchinson [R] | Sen. Cris Dush [R] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] |
Sen. Timothy Kearney [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-25 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2024-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2024-06-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |