CA AB2484 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 367.75 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to courts.
Title
Courts: juveniles: remote proceedings.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0.) |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 19). |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-03-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 367.75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |