NY S09092 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Introduced on June 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete a boating safety course.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateRECOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-06-18SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1917
2018-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09806 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback