CA SB445 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 906, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 56348 to the Education Code, relating to special education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special education: standardized individualized education program template: translation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB445 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-26 - Assembly - SB 445 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB445 Portantino et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 906, Statutes of 2024.
2024-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2024-09-09 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2024-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5655.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2024-08-26SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2024-08-26AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6543.) Ordered to the Senate.
2024-08-22AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-08-22AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2024-08-22AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(b)(1) suspended.
2024-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2024-08-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2024-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15).
2024-08-07AssemblyAugust 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2024-06-27AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2024-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2024-06-13AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2024-06-13AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-06-13AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2024-06-10AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2024-06-10AssemblyFrom inactive file.
2024-06-06AssemblyNotice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Flora.
2023-09-12AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Boerner.
2023-09-05AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-09-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2023-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2023-06-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2023-06-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1391.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1171.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-04-10SenateApril 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2023-03-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-03-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 451.) (March 22).
2023-03-02SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2023-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2023-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2023-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code56348New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445#94AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445#93AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445#92ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445#91CHP
Roll Callhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202320240SB445

Bill Comments

feedback