NY S07677 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-7)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete an in-classroom boating safety course.
Title
Enacts Brianna's Law; requires that operators of mechanically propelled vessels complete an in-classroom boating safety course.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.907 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09806 (Same As) 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES